MD SB913 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that certain requests by retiree organizations to the Board of Trustees for the State Pension and Retirement System to assist the retiree organization in performing direct mailings to retirees of the State Retirement and Pension System who are members of the retiree organization or eligible to become members of the retiree organization be made once in April and once in October.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Administration - Retiree Information for Direct Mailings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 9:00 a.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Investigations and Inquiries
Postal Service
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Investigations and Inquiries
Postal Service
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement