MD SB916 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that certain provisions of law do not prohibit a certain licensed physician from dispensing a topical medication; authorizing a physician to dispense a certain topical medication if the physician meets certain requirements; authorizing the State Board of Physicians to issue a written permit to certain physicians under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Physicians – Dispensing Permit Exemption – Topical Medication
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2019-04-03 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {134736/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Continuing Education
Data
Discipline
Drugs
Fees
Health Occupations
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Physicians
Communications
Continuing Education
Data
Discipline
Drugs
Fees
Health Occupations
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Physicians