MD SB917 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the planning commissions for certain local jurisdictions to include a housing element in the comprehensive plan for their respective jurisdictions; requiring the housing element to address the need for affordable housing within the jurisdiction, including workforce housing and low-income housing; authorizing the housing element to include goals, objectives, policies, plans, and standards; and applying the Act prospectively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land Use - Comprehensive Plans - Housing Element

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-40) (Y: 96 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (96-40)
2019-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-04-06HouseRereferred to Environment and Transportation
2019-04-06HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {904639/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-07SenateHearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
2019-03-07SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-26SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-14SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback