MD SB918 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB299
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission on Trauma-Informed Care to coordinate a statewide initiative to prioritize the trauma-responsive and trauma-informed delivery of State services that impact children, youth, families and older adults; requiring the Commission to submit a certain report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by June 30 each year; requiring certain State agencies to designate certain staff members to participate in certain training each year; etc.
Title
Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {707079/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB918 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Attorney General
Budget and Management, Department of
Children
Children, Governor's Office for
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Disabilities, Department of
Disclosure
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Ethics
Federal Government
Governor
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Injury
Job Training
Juvenile Services, Department of
Medical Treatments
Natural Resources, Department of
Planning, Department of
Public Health
Public Officials
Public Works, Board of
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Police, Department of
Transportation, Department of
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth
Attorney General
Budget and Management, Department of
Children
Children, Governor's Office for
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Disabilities, Department of
Disclosure
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Ethics
Federal Government
Governor
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Injury
Job Training
Juvenile Services, Department of
Medical Treatments
Natural Resources, Department of
Planning, Department of
Public Health
Public Officials
Public Works, Board of
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Police, Department of
Transportation, Department of
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 8 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |