MD SB919 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Felony Murder to review the provisions, penalties, and jurisprudence for felony murder, including its applicability to juveniles, in the State and in other states; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations regarding the current statutory scheme for felony murder to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31, 2020; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Task Force to Study Felony Murder
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-9) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment {838170/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {838170/1 |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB1308 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Abduction
Arson
Burglary
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Hearings
Hijacking
Judicial Review
Legislative Services, Department of
Murder
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Robbery
Sexual Offenses
Sunset
Trials
Arson
Burglary
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Hearings
Hijacking
Judicial Review
Legislative Services, Department of
Murder
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Robbery
Sexual Offenses
Sunset
Trials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 2 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 2 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |