MD SB922 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from stating on a label of a food product that the product is milk unless the product meets a certain definition; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish and implement a plan to enforce a certain prohibition, including notice of the Department's intent to implement a ban on all products that do not meet certain requirements; requiring the Department to track certain legislation and notify the Department of Legislative Services of a certain occurrence within a certain period of time; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health – Milk – Labeling

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-10) (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (118-21) (Y: 118 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-10) (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 530
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (36-10)
2019-04-08SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (118-21)
2019-04-06HouseFloor Committee Amendment {600717/1 Adopted
2019-04-05HouseSpecial Order until 04/06 (Delegate Stein) Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFloor Committee Amendment {550919/1 Adopted
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {650515/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (36-10)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {214231/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-07SenateHearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
2019-03-07SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-26SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-14SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0922&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0922f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0922t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0922e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_530_sb0922e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0922_21423101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0922_55091901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0922_65051501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0922_60071701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/sb0922.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0922_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0680.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0922_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1473.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1388.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback