MD SB927 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certain entity to register with the State Ethics Commission as a regulated lobbyist if, during a certain reporting period, the entity spends a certain amount for issue lobbying communications; requiring a certain regulated lobbyist to report certain information to the Ethics Commission in addition to certain other reports; requiring a certain regulated lobbyist to report certain information to the Ethics Commission within a certain period of time on receipt of an aggregate donation of a certain amount; etc.
Title
Public Ethics - Issue Lobbying Communications - Lobbyist Registration and Disclosure Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] | Sen. Arthur Ellis [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] |
Sen. William Smith [D] | Sen. Craig Zucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - Senate - Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Kagan) Adopted (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Kagan) Adopted (30-15) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {614234/1 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {614234/1 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB953 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Advertising
Ballots
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Disclosure
Elections
Emergency Bills
Ethics
Gifts
Lobbying
Names
News Media
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Political Candidates
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Solicitation
Time
Voting
Advertising
Ballots
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Disclosure
Elections
Emergency Bills
Ethics
Gifts
Lobbying
Names
News Media
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Political Candidates
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Solicitation
Time
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 5 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 717 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 718 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |