MD SB929 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain expenses of a tax exempt corporation that are required to be included in the corporation's unrelated business taxable income; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification From Unrelated Business Taxable Income - Employee Benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |