MD SB929 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain employees of certain State law enforcement agencies to enforce certain motor vehicle laws within Baltimore City under a certain memorandum of understanding; establishing the P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program to maximize the use of available resources to combat neighborhood decline and support strategies to reduce crime in Baltimore City and the State; requiring the Department of Juvenile Services to submit a certain report to certain committees; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Baltimore City - P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (128-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {682112/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-4) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment {973127/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment {633825/1 (Senator Hayes) Adopted |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {798177/1 Adopted |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1408 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Community Facilities and Services
Contracts
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
General Services, Department of
Governor
Grants
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Services, Department of
Local Government Mandates
Motor Vehicles
Nuisances
Parole and Probation
Pretrial Detention or Release
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Police, Department of
Transportation, Department of
Youth
Baltimore City
Budgets
Community Facilities and Services
Contracts
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
General Services, Department of
Governor
Grants
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Services, Department of
Local Government Mandates
Motor Vehicles
Nuisances
Parole and Probation
Pretrial Detention or Release
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Police, Department of
Transportation, Department of
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 2 | 412 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 4 | 1501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 4 | 1502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 4 | 1503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 4 | 1504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |