MD SB930 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a Workgroup to Study Shelter and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Minors; requiring the Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness to provide staff for the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to compile existing information on the needs of unaccompanied homeless minors, identify resources available to meet those needs, and identify barriers to accessing safe shelter; requiring the Workgroup to report its recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workgroup to Study Shelter and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Minors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-28HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2019-03-26HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments {688975/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-21SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-25SenateHearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-25SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-22SenateHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback