MD SB933 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a physician, qualified health care provider, and hospital from including a narrative describing the alleged offense or a photograph of the victim in a request to obtain payment for certain services related to forensic examinations for certain sexually related crimes under certain circumstances; altering the services for which the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board is required to pay certain claims and for which a physician and a qualified health care provider are immune from civil liability under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy and Reimbursement
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] |
Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Criminal Law - Procedure
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Liability
Privacy
Sexual Offenses
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Criminal Law - Procedure
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Liability
Privacy
Sexual Offenses