MD SB939 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting under certain circumstances certain activities and the use of certain equipment that is associated with a shellfish nursery operation from the requirement to obtain certain licenses or permits from the Department of the Environment or the Board of Public Works; providing that the installation of a pump, pipe, or other equipment that is attached to a pier for the cultivation of shellfish seed under a certain permit is a lawful use on private wetlands under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 237
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-06HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-04-04HouseRereferred to Environment and Transportation
2019-04-03HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {374032/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-07SenateHearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
2019-03-07SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-27SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback