MD SB94 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain Consumer Price Index used for calculating the target per pupil foundation amount and the student transportation amount for education; and altering certain references to the Consumer Price Index for the Washington-Baltimore Metropolitan Area in the Annotated Code to refer to the Consumer Price Index for the Washington Metropolitan Area.
Title
State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 5 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-02-26 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-02-22 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {929832/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Commerce, Department of
Consumer Price Index
Contractors
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Insurance
Mediation
Montgomery County
Names
Procurement
Real Property
State Government - General Assembly
Utilities
Work, Labor and Employment
Zoning and Planning
Consumer Price Index
Contractors
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Insurance
Mediation
Montgomery County
Names
Procurement
Real Property
State Government - General Assembly
Utilities
Work, Labor and Employment
Zoning and Planning