MD SB940 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a provision of law exempting certain offices from certificate of need requirements under certain circumstances; providing that a certificate of need is required before the type or scope of any health care service is changed if the health care service results in a change in operating room capacity in a certain health care facility; repealing a provision of law authorizing a hospital to acquire a freestanding ambulatory surgical facility or a certain office or group practice under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Health Care Facilities - Certificate of Need - Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {447474/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Capital Budgets
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Data
Examinations
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Medical Treatments
Revenue and Taxes
Capital Budgets
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Data
Examinations
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Medical Treatments
Revenue and Taxes