MD SB942 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a Baltimore City police officer without a warrant to arrest a person suspected of committing battery against a certain Baltimore City special enforcement officer, special parking enforcement officer, or special traffic enforcement officer under certain circumstances.
Title
Baltimore City - Police Officers - Warrantless Arrests
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Arrests
Assault
Baltimore City
Counties - Local Laws
Evidence
Injury
Law Enforcement
Property Damage
Public Safety
Assault
Baltimore City
Counties - Local Laws
Evidence
Injury
Law Enforcement
Property Damage
Public Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Baltimore City | 16 | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |