MD SB943 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 718
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 718
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Governor to appoint a substitute member to the Talbot County Board of License Commissioners; requiring the substitute member to serve on the Board under certain circumstances; and establishing the powers and duties of the substitute member when serving on the Board.
Title
Talbot County - Alcoholic Beverages - Substitute Member for Board of License Commissioners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 718 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Governor
License Commissioners, Boards of
Public Officials
Talbot County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Governor
License Commissioners, Boards of
Public Officials
Talbot County