MD SB945 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Defining "telephone answering service" for the purpose of establishing that the service is taxable under the sales and use tax only if the service consists exclusively of answering a telephone in a certain manner and transmitting messages to the customer; establishing that a telephone answering service is not a taxable service if certain acts are only incidental to and less than 5% of the service provider's total gross receipts in a calendar year; etc.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Services - Telephone Answering Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2019-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-04-01 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2019-04-01 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Emergency Bills
Sales and Use Tax
Taxes - Sales and Use
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Sales and Use Tax
Taxes - Sales and Use
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones