MD SB949 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Grant Program for Workforce Skills Assessment in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; providing that the purpose of the Program is to provide financial assistance to an employer for the administration of assessments that measure workplace or job-related skills of employees who are State residents; authorizing the Governor to include an annual appropriation to the Program in the State budget; requiring the Department to implement and administer the Program and adopt certain regulations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment - Grant Program for Workforce Skills Assessment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseRereferred to Economic Matters
2019-04-01HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (42-0)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-04SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback