MD SB955 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 768
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 768
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a holder of a Class D beer, wine, and liquor license in Kent County to sell alcoholic beverages for off-premises consumption as well as on-premises consumption; increasing to 15 the maximum number of rooms that a facility with a Class B (country inn) beer, wine, and liquor license may offer to the public as sleeping accommodations; decreasing to 100 the minimum number of permanently installed seats required in a theater with a theater beer, wine, and liquor license; etc.
Title
Kent County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 768 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-29 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-29 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-27 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Hotels and Motels
Kent County
Motion Pictures
Retail Sales
Theaters
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Hotels and Motels
Kent County
Motion Pictures
Retail Sales
Theaters
Time