MD SB956 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain retired employees of a county, municipal corporation, or county board to participate in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits program under certain circumstances; and requiring the governing body of a county, municipal corporation, or county board to pay certain costs and to make certain determinations with regard to certain retirees under certain circumstances.
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation - County, Municipal Corporation, or County Board Retirees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 8:30 a.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB602 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Fees
Health
Health Insurance
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Public Employees
Retirement
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
State Pensions and Retirement
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Fees
Health
Health Insurance
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Public Employees
Retirement
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
State Pensions and Retirement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 2 | 508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 2 | 513 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0956?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0956f.pdf |