MD SB957 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Sheriff of Calvert County to appoint correctional deputies in a number and at a salary approved by the County Commissioners; providing that correctional deputies serve under the Sheriff of Calvert County; requiring Calvert County correctional deputies to complete certain training provided by the Maryland Police and Correctional Training Commissions; providing that certain Calvert County correctional deputies may become merit system employees under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Office of the Sheriff - Correctional Deputies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-03-22 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Calvert County
Correctional Officers
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Job Training
Police Training and Standards Commission
Sheriffs
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Correctional Officers
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Job Training
Police Training and Standards Commission
Sheriffs
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment