MD SB96 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 849
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 849
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that both parties appear before the court at an absolute divorce hearing in order for the court to decree an absolute divorce on the grounds of mutual consent.
Title
Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Court Appearance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-11) (Y: 125 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-10) (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-10) (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-26 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 849 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-11) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-10) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/11 at 1:15 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |