MD SB96 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring Baltimore City to withhold from tax sale certain places of worship if the taxes on the property consist only of a lien for unpaid charges for water and sewer service; repealing the authority of the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to sell certain properties to enforce a lien for unpaid charges for water and sewer service if the properties are also being sold to enforce another lien; repealing a certain authority to sell certain real property owned by religious groups or organizations; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Washington [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] |
Sen. Cory McCray [D] | Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {529233/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Recommitted to Budget and Taxation (Senator Ferguson) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {529233/1 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Counties - Local Laws
Judgments
Liens
Places of Worship
Real Property
Sewage
Sunset
Tax Sales
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Water
Counties - Local Laws
Judgments
Liens
Places of Worship
Real Property
Sewage
Sunset
Tax Sales
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Water