MD SB961 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, beginning in the 2020-2021 school year, each county board of education to require each public elementary school in the county to provide handwriting instruction that enables students to develop legible print handwriting by the end of the third grade and legible cursive handwriting by the end of the fifth grade.
Title
Education - Public Schools - Instruction in Print and Cursive Handwriting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Communications
Curriculum
Education
Education, Boards of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Students
Teachers
Curriculum
Education
Education, Boards of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Students
Teachers