MD SB962 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the contents of the certificate of a qualified expert to include a statement from a qualified expert that the licensed professional failed to meet an applicable standard of professional care and supervision; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Hough [R] | Sen. Gail Bates [R] | Sen. Bob Cassilly [R] | Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] |
Sen. Justin Ready [R] | Sen. Johnny Salling [R] | Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] | Sen. Stephen Waugh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Architects
Civil Actions and Procedures
Courts
Engineers
Interior Designers
Landscape Architects
Licenses
Records
Surveyors
Civil Actions and Procedures
Courts
Engineers
Interior Designers
Landscape Architects
Licenses
Records
Surveyors