MD SB962 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services, on or before January 1, 2020, to establish an Offender Rehabilitation and Reentry Program to provide and coordinate the delivery of community services to recently released ex-offenders; requiring the Governor to include $250,000 annually in the State budget for certain purposes; requiring the Department to cooperate with, assist, and provide technical assistance to qualified reentry service programs that provide certain services to ex-offenders; etc.
Title
Correctional Services - Offender Rehabilitation and Reentry Program - Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Community Facilities and Services
Domestic Violence
Drivers' Licenses
Education
Expungement
Food
Governor
Grants
Health
Health Insurance
Housing
Identification
Job Training
Legal Aid
Literacy
Mental and Behavioral Health
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Rules and Regulations
Social Security
Substance Abuse
Support of Dependents
Victims
Vital Records
Budgets
Community Facilities and Services
Domestic Violence
Drivers' Licenses
Education
Expungement
Food
Governor
Grants
Health
Health Insurance
Housing
Identification
Job Training
Legal Aid
Literacy
Mental and Behavioral Health
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Rules and Regulations
Social Security
Substance Abuse
Support of Dependents
Victims
Vital Records