MD SB966 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force on the Effectiveness of State Crime Laboratories; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2021; etc.
Title
Task Force on the Effectiveness of State Crime Laboratories
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-18 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Evidence
Laboratories
Public Safety
Reports
Sunset
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Evidence
Laboratories
Public Safety
Reports
Sunset
Time
Work, Labor and Employment