MD SB966 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 589
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 589
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a certain violation of a certain provision of law shall be a violation of the Consumer Protection Act; prohibiting a person from knowingly and willfully referring another person to a certain assisted living program; establishing certain penalties for certain violations of the Act; requiring the Secretary of Health to remit certain penalties to the Office of Health Care Quality for a certain purpose; etc.
Title
Health Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Referrals and Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 589 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-16 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {837678/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1615 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-19 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Assisted Living
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Assisted Living
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 1804.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 1809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 1813 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |