MD SB969 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that certain regulations adopted by the Maryland Department of Health relating to assisted living programs include requiring an assisted living program to complete a certain assessment tool within a certain period of time and requiring a certain program manager to invite certain individuals to participate in certain resident assessments; requiring that certain assisted living programs have certain staff-to-resident ratios at certain assisted living program facilities under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Regulations, Staffing, and Training
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1063 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Assisted Living
Caregivers
Communications
Consumer Protection
Education
Examinations
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
Prices
Rules and Regulations
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Assisted Living
Caregivers
Communications
Consumer Protection
Education
Examinations
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
Prices
Rules and Regulations
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 1805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 1805.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 1807 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |