MD SB972 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law establishing and relating to the Civilian Review Board of Baltimore City; establishing the Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City; specifying the purpose of the Commission; providing for the composition, chair, voting, terms, powers, duties, staffing, procedures, and reporting of the Commission; establishing certain requirements for members of the Commission; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Arrests
Attorneys
Baltimore City
Budgets
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Counties - Local Laws
Crimes and Punishments
Death
Discipline
Discrimination
Electronic Government
Evidence
Expungement
Harassment
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Oaths
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Information
Public Safety
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Search and Seizure
Subpoenas
Violence
Weapons
Witnesses
Attorneys
Baltimore City
Budgets
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Counties - Local Laws
Crimes and Punishments
Death
Discipline
Discrimination
Electronic Government
Evidence
Expungement
Harassment
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Oaths
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Information
Public Safety
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Search and Seizure
Subpoenas
Violence
Weapons
Witnesses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 3 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 16 | 41 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 16 | 42 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 16 | 43 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 16 | 44 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 16 | 45 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 16 | 46 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 16 | 47 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 16 | 48 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 16 | 49 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 16 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 16 | 51 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 16 | 52 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 16 | 53 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 16 | 54 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |