MD SB973 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission, the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services, the Department of Labor, and the Department of Human Services to make certain reports to the Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness on or before November 15, 2020, and November 15, 2021.
Title
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Reports on Housing Status
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB1031 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Housing
Human Services, Department of
Indigent Persons
Labor, Department of
Parole and Probation
Patients
Prisoners
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Work, Labor and Employment
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Housing
Human Services, Department of
Indigent Persons
Labor, Department of
Parole and Probation
Patients
Prisoners
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Work, Labor and Employment