MD SB974 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting certain departments or local licensing authorities that issue occupational licenses or certificates from denying an application for a license or certificate based on the applicant's criminal history if a period of 5 years has passed since the applicant's conviction for a nonviolent crime unless the department or local licensing authority makes a certain determination; requiring a licensing authority to include in applications a list of specific convictions that would disqualify an applicant; etc.
Title
Occupational Licenses or Certificates - Application Determinations - Use of Criminal History
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-18 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Agriculture, Department of
Business Regulation and Occupations
Certifications
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Criminal Law - Procedure
Environment, Department of the
Ex-Offenders
Health, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Parole and Probation
Petitions
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Business Regulation and Occupations
Certifications
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Criminal Law - Procedure
Environment, Department of the
Ex-Offenders
Health, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Parole and Probation
Petitions
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of