MD SB975 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish a delivery system for certain specialty behavioral health services, rather than for only specialty mental health services, for enrollees of managed care organizations; requiring the delivery system to assume certain financial risk; requiring the delivery system to provide certain services to certain individuals; requiring the delivery system to reimburse certain providers and collect certain data; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Behavioral Health Transformation Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
2019-03-14SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-04SenateHearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-18SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback