MD SB976 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Secretary of Health to convene a stakeholder workgroup to develop certain implementation plans to improve efficiency, accountability, and outcomes of certain specialty behavioral health services; requiring the workgroup to include certain representatives; requiring that certain implementation plans include certain recommendations for a certain timeline and certain necessary steps to achieve certain outcomes; requiring the Secretary of Health to submit certain reports on or before certain dates; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Behavioral Health System - Implementation Plans to Improve Efficiency, Accountability, and Outcomes - Workgroup

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
2019-03-14SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-04SenateHearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-18SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback