MD SB98 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB666
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a county board, public prekindergarten program or primary or secondary school, or nonpublic prekindergarten program or primary or secondary school that receives State funds from discriminating against a person, refusing enrollment of, expelling, or withholding privileges from any student or prospective student, or taking certain retaliatory actions on the basis of race, ethnicity, color, religion, sex, age, national origin, marital status, sexual orientation, gender identity, or disability; providing certain penalties; etc.
Title
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-10-26 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB98 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
HB155 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-26 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB155 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-26 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Age
Appeals
Appropriations
Budgets
Comptroller
Disabilities
Discipline
Discrimination
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Hearings
Human Relations
Marriage
Mediation
Minorities
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Religion
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Students
Appeals
Appropriations
Budgets
Comptroller
Disabilities
Discipline
Discrimination
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Hearings
Human Relations
Marriage
Mediation
Minorities
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Religion
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Students
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 2 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |