MD SB980 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the billing rights for anesthesia services provided in a freestanding ambulatory care facility from being assigned to a person that has a beneficial interest in the freestanding ambulatory care facility; prohibiting a freestanding ambulatory care facility or a person that has a beneficial interest in the freestanding ambulatory care facility from charging, directly or indirectly, an anesthesia services provider a fee for management services; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anesthesia Services - Assignment of Billing Rights and Fees for Management Services - Prohibition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-10SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
2014-03-06SenateHearing cancelled
2014-03-19SenateHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-26SenateHearing cancelled
2014-03-12SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-18SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-02-10SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback