MD SB980 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from offering or participating in a commercial game or competition that includes the elements of consideration, chance, and reward; requiring specified units of State and local government to narrowly construe sections of law that authorize specified types of gaming; altering the definition of fantasy sports competitions; providing for regulation of specified fantasy sports competitions by the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gaming - Traditional Noncommercial Fantasy Competitions - Clarification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-07HouseHearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-03-29HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2016-03-24HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2016-03-23SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2016-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments {319035/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2016-03-11SenateHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-18SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2016-02-12SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback