MD SB982 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission to Study Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Funding to review the State's funding requirements for non-emergency medical transportation services and the impact on locally operated transit systems; requiring the Commission to consider certain matters as part of the study; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and to certain committees of the General Assembly by June 30, 2020; etc.
Title
Commission to Study Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Funding
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Ellis [D] | Sen. Mary Carozza [R] | Sen. Jason Gallion [R] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Sen. Obie Patterson [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. Mary Washington [D] |
Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Finance) and Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) and Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-18 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Health
Health, Department of
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Health
Health, Department of
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of