MD SB983 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Secretary of General Services, the Secretary of Transportation, the Chancellor of the University System of Maryland, and the President of Morgan State University to adopt certain regulations on or before December 31, 2019, to require the qualification of a business as a small business under certain circumstances; requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations providing for the certification of a business as a minority business enterprise under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procurement - Small Businesses and Minority Businesses - Qualification and Certification (Small and Minority Business Certification Streamlining Act of 2019)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-04-02HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-01HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-04-01HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (42-0)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {684936/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-07SenateHearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
2019-03-07SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-26SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-18SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback