MD SB984 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the definition of "strategic industry partnership" for purposes of certain provisions of law governing the Maryland EARN Program to include employers from a target industry and representatives of labor organizations associated with the target industry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland EARN Program - Strategic Industry Partnership - Definition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
2019-03-04SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-18SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback