MD SB988 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-06 - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-06 - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering from 1 year to 2 years, the number of years before the end of the term of a video lottery operation license that a licensee may apply for renewal of the license; providing for a 10-year term for a renewed license; requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to renew a certain license unless the Commission finds the licensee is no longer qualified; requiring the Commission, before denying an application, to provide a licensee an opportunity for a hearing; etc.
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-06 | House | Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-04-06 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2019-04-03 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-20 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |