MD SB989 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the court to impose, on a person convicted of a hate crime, a requirement to attend an anti-bias education program.
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Penalty (Educate Against Hate Act)
Sponsors
Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] | Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] |
Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] | Sen. Chris West [R] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {478777/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB485 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-24 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Discrimination
Education
Penalties and Sentences
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Discrimination
Education
Penalties and Sentences
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 10 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 10 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 10 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |