MD SB991 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to issue a Class B-D-7 license in a certain area of the 45th alcoholic beverages district if the applicant meets certain requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-15SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-26SenateHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-20SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback