MD SB996 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that July 27 each year is Welcome Home Korean War Veterans Day in recognition of the service and sacrifice of Korean War veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Welcome Home Korean War Veterans Day

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-25SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-21SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-20SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback