MD SB996 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a tax sale of certain property if the tax has been in arrears for at least 5 years, subject to certain exceptions.
Title
Tax - Property - Tax Sales
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB657 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 14 | 808 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 14 | 811 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0996?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0996f.pdf |