MD SB998 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the REAL School Gardens Pilot Program to design and build custom outdoor classrooms at certain public elementary schools and to train teachers to use outdoor classrooms; requiring certain jurisdictions to implement the Program; requiring the Governor's proposed budget for fiscal year 2020 to appropriate $200,000 to the Department to be used only for the Program; requiring the Department to obtain the services of an independent third party to conduct a certain review on or before June 30, 2020; etc.
Title
State Department of Education - REAL School Gardens Pilot Program - Established
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {564537/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Education
Education, State Department of
Governor
Howard County
Jurisdiction
Montgomery County
Primary and Secondary Education
Prince George's County
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Education
Education, State Department of
Governor
Howard County
Jurisdiction
Montgomery County
Primary and Secondary Education
Prince George's County
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Time