MD SJ5 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Designating July 27, 2019, as Welcome Home Korean War Veterans Day; and providing that the designation is an appropriate way for the State to properly thank and honor its members of the United States armed forces for their service and sacrifice during the Korean War.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Welcome Home Korean War Veterans Day

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {504235/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-27SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-26SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-26SenateMotion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Carozza) Adopted
2019-03-26SenateMotion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Carozza) Adopted
2019-03-22SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback