MD SJ5 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJ1
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-06 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-06 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the U.S. Congress to pass legislation that prohibits the balance billing of consumers by certain air ambulances.
Title
Congressional Action - Surprise Billing - Air Ambulance
Sponsors
Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] |
Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] | Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Sen. Mary Washington [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {497775/1 Adopted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SJ5 (Carry Over) 2020-03-06 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Aircraft
Ambulances
Congress, U.S.
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Legislative Services, Department of
Prices
Ambulances
Congress, U.S.
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Legislative Services, Department of
Prices