MD SJ6 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Commemorating the bicentennial of the birth of Frederick Douglass; and providing that a copy of this resolution be forwarded by the Department of Legislative Services to certain individuals.
Title
Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 11:30 a.m. |
2018-02-28 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {334234/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Ethnic Affairs
Historical Matters
Human Rights
Legislative Services, Department of
State Government - General Assembly
Historical Matters
Human Rights
Legislative Services, Department of
State Government - General Assembly