ME LD1016 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Require the Construction of a New District Headquarters Building for the Bureau of Forestry in Fort Kent
Title
Resolve, To Require the Construction of a New District Headquarters Building for the Bureau of Forestry in Fort Kent
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION |
2020-01-14 | Senate | RECALLED From Governor's Desk pursuant to Joint Order SP 704. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-06-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-94) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-335) thereto. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-94) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-335) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-94) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-335) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-335) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-94) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-94) was ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-94) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-21 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-05-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-16 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-94). |
2019-05-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-94) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-16 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-16 | House | On motion of Representative HICKMAN of Winthrop, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-94) |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-94) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-02-26 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-26 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |